Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 08/02/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 10/11/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/11/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 10/11/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 10/11/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 10/11/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 10/11/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 10/11/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/11/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/11/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/11/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/23/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/12/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 01/10/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/10/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 01/10/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/29/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 01/29/2014