Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/09/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/10/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/10/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 07/10/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/11/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/23/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/23/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/24/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 07/24/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 07/24/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/25/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/26/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 07/26/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 07/31/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 09/10/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/16/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/23/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 09/26/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/16/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 12/02/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/13/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew