Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 02/15/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 02/15/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/15/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 02/15/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 02/28/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/24/2013
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/25/2013