Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 01/03/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 01/03/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 01/15/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 01/15/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/15/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 01/15/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 01/15/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 01/15/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/15/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/15/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 01/15/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 01/15/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/15/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 01/15/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 01/15/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/15/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/15/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/15/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 01/15/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/25/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 02/25/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/25/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/25/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/25/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/25/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/25/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 02/25/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/25/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/25/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 02/25/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/25/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/25/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/25/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 03/04/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/04/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/04/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 03/15/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 03/15/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/15/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/11/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/09/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/30/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/10/2014