Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 01/03/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 01/03/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 01/15/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/15/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 01/15/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 01/15/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/15/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/15/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 01/15/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 01/15/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/15/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/15/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/25/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/25/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/25/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/25/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/25/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/25/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/25/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/25/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/25/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 03/04/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 03/15/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/11/2013
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 07/09/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/09/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/09/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/30/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 08/02/2013