Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/07/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/07/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/11/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 11/20/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 12/02/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/11/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/07/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/28/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/11/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 04/01/2014