Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/18/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 04/18/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/18/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/24/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/26/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 04/26/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/06/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/06/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/15/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/15/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/17/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/17/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 05/21/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 05/21/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/21/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/22/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/04/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/25/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/25/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/25/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/25/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/25/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/28/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/08/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/10/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/16/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/31/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/31/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/19/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/27/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/28/2013