Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 04/10/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/12/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 04/12/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/12/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 04/12/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/12/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 04/12/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/12/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 04/12/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 04/12/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 04/12/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/12/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/12/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 04/12/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/12/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 04/12/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/12/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 04/12/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 04/12/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/12/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/12/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/12/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 04/12/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 04/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/12/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/12/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 04/12/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/12/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/12/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 04/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/12/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/12/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/12/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 04/12/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/12/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 04/12/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/12/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 04/12/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/12/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 04/12/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/12/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/12/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 04/12/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/12/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/12/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/12/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/12/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/12/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/12/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/12/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 04/12/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 04/12/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/12/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/12/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/12/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/12/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/12/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 04/12/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/12/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 04/12/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/12/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/12/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 04/12/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 04/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 04/15/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/15/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/15/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/15/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/15/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/15/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/15/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 04/15/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 04/15/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/15/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/15/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/15/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/15/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/15/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/15/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/15/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 04/15/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 04/15/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/15/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/15/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/15/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/15/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 04/15/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/15/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/15/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/15/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 04/15/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 04/15/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/15/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/15/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/15/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 04/15/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/15/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 04/15/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/15/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/15/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/15/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 04/15/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/15/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/15/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/15/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/16/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 04/16/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/16/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/16/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/03/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/03/2013