Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/30/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/30/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/03/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/03/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/06/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/08/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/13/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/27/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/11/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 12/12/2013