Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/09/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 04/09/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/11/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/11/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/11/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/11/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 05/16/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/16/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/11/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/11/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/11/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/11/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/11/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/11/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 06/11/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/11/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 06/11/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/14/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 06/14/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/25/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 03/26/2014