Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/19/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/25/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/15/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 01/13/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 02/04/2014