Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 03/14/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 03/14/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/20/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/20/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 03/20/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/20/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/20/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 03/20/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 03/20/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 03/21/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/09/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 04/09/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/11/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/11/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/15/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/04/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/11/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/12/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/14/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 06/17/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/18/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 06/26/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/26/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/26/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 06/28/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/08/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 07/16/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/22/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 07/31/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 08/02/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 08/02/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 08/02/2013