Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 03/06/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/06/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 03/06/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 03/13/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/13/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/13/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/13/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/24/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 05/08/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 05/08/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/16/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/16/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/04/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/16/2013