Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/10/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 04/10/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/10/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/10/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 04/10/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/09/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/09/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/20/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/20/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/21/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/21/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/05/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 06/05/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 06/05/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/09/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/09/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/30/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/31/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/18/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 09/27/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 09/27/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/09/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/12/2014