Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/05/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/13/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/13/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/13/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/15/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/10/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 01/16/2014