Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/23/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/23/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/24/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/16/2013