Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/05/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 03/05/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 03/12/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/13/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/13/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/13/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/13/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/14/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/21/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/25/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/09/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/09/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/10/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/17/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 06/03/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/06/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/12/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 07/11/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/16/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/16/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/13/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/26/2014