Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/25/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/23/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/14/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/28/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/04/2013