Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/05/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 03/05/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 03/07/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/12/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/12/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/21/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/10/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/19/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 05/14/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/13/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/13/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/08/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/25/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/30/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 07/30/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/30/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/31/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 08/02/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 08/02/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/09/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 12/02/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/09/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 01/17/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/31/2014
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/31/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/03/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/04/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/26/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/27/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/08/2014