Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/11/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/11/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/24/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/24/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/24/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/24/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/24/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/24/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/24/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/24/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 04/24/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/24/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/24/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/24/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/24/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/24/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 04/24/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/24/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 04/24/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/09/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/09/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 05/09/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/09/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/09/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/09/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 05/17/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/17/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/17/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/17/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/17/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/23/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/06/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 06/06/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/20/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/20/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/28/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/11/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 07/11/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/11/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/19/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/19/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 08/02/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 08/02/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 08/02/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/12/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/12/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/12/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/12/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/12/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/12/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 09/12/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/12/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/12/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/30/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/30/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/30/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/30/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 09/30/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/16/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/16/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 11/18/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 11/18/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 12/16/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 01/29/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/29/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/14/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/25/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/25/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 03/25/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/25/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 03/25/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 04/04/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/04/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 04/04/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/04/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/04/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/04/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/04/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/04/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/10/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/10/2014