Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/04/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/06/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/15/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 03/19/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 04/23/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 05/24/2013