Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/12/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 03/15/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 05/14/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/23/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/25/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 11/13/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 12/03/2013