Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/04/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/06/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 03/06/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/06/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/06/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/06/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/06/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/06/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/06/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/06/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/06/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 03/06/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/06/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/06/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/06/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/06/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/06/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/12/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/12/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/12/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/12/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/12/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/12/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/12/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 03/12/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/12/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/13/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 03/13/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/13/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/15/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/15/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/15/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/15/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/15/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/15/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/15/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/15/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 03/15/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/18/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/18/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/18/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 03/18/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 03/19/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 03/20/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 03/25/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/25/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/09/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/10/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 04/11/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 04/15/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/16/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 04/17/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/23/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 04/23/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 04/23/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/23/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/14/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/14/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 05/14/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 05/16/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/20/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/20/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 05/20/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 05/20/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/20/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/20/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 05/20/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/22/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/23/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 05/24/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 05/24/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 06/03/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 06/04/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/04/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/05/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 06/05/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/06/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/18/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/26/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/08/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 07/08/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 07/17/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/17/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/25/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/27/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 10/07/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 10/22/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 11/13/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 12/03/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/09/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 01/10/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/13/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 01/16/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 01/21/2014