Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/06/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/06/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/07/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/14/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/23/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/24/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/03/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/30/2013