Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 03/04/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/05/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/05/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/05/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 04/10/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/10/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/10/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/10/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/10/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 04/10/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/10/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/10/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 04/10/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/10/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/10/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 05/08/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/08/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/08/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/08/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 07/19/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 07/19/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/19/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/19/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/19/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/13/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/14/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/10/2014