Refine your search

  • S.Amdt.129 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To revise language regarding cluster munitions.
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 03/18/2013) (Proposed 03/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 129 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S1986)
  • S.Amdt.123 to S.Amdt.115 (which amends S.Amdt.26)   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To change the enactment date.
    Sponsor: Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] (Submitted 03/14/2013) (Proposed 03/14/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Proposed amendment SA 123 withdrawn in Senate.
  • S.Amdt.53 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] (Submitted 03/13/2013) (Proposed 03/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 03/14/13 Amendment SA 53, under the order of 3/13/2013, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 36.
  • S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: In the nature of a substitute.
    Sponsor: Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] (Submitted 03/11/2013) (Proposed 03/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 26 as modified, as amended, agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 70 - 29. Record Vote Number: 42.