Refine your search

  • S.Amdt.176 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To amend the title.
    Sponsor: Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] (Submitted 03/20/2013) (Proposed 03/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 03/21/13 Amendment SA 176 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  • S.Amdt.129 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To revise language regarding cluster munitions.
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 03/18/2013) (Proposed 03/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 129 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S1986)
  • S.Amdt.98 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] (Submitted 03/14/2013) (Proposed 03/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 98 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S1985)
  • S.Amdt.93 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To transfer appropriations from the National Heritage Partnership Program to fund the resumption of public tours of the White House and visitor services and maintenance at national parks and monuments.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 03/14/2013) (Proposed 03/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 93, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 45 - 54. Record Vote Number: 40.
  • S.Amdt.123 to S.Amdt.115 (which amends S.Amdt.26)   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To change the enactment date.
    Sponsor: Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] (Submitted 03/14/2013) (Proposed 03/14/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Proposed amendment SA 123 withdrawn in Senate.
  • S.Amdt.115 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To increase by $25,000,000 the amount appropriated for Operation and Maintenance for the Department of Defense for programs, projects, and activities in the continental United States, and to provide an offset.
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 03/14/2013) (Proposed 03/14/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 115, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 40 - 59. Record Vote Number: 41. (text as modified: CR S1986)
  • S.Amdt.82 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: Relative to Agriculture Buildings and Facilities and Rental Payments, Food Safety and Inspection Service, and Domestic Food Programs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] (Submitted 03/13/2013) (Proposed 03/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 6
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 82 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.72 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To require the continuation of tuition assistance programs for members of the Armed Forces for the remainder of fiscal year 2013.
    Sponsor: Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] (Submitted 03/13/2013) (Proposed 03/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 23
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 72 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S1985)
  • S.Amdt.70 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To ensure that authorizing committees receive timely information from the Department of Homeland Security.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 03/13/2013) (Proposed 03/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 70 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S1976-1977)
  • S.Amdt.69 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To prohibit Urban Area Security Initiative grant recipients from funding projects that do not improve homeland security.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 03/13/2013) (Proposed 03/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 69, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 48 - 51. Record Vote Number: 39.
  • S.Amdt.66 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To temporarily freeze the hiring of nonessential Federal employees.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 03/13/2013) (Proposed 03/14/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 03/14/13 Amendment SA 66, under the order of 3/14/2013, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 45 - 54. Record Vote Number: 37. (consideration: CR S1829-1832; text: CR S1832)
  • S.Amdt.65 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To prohibit the use of funds to carry out the functions of the Political Science Program in the Division of Social and Economic Sciences of the Directorate for Social, Behavioral, and Economic Sciences of the National Science Foundation, except for research projects that the Director of the National Science Foundation certifies as promoting national security or the economic interests of the United States.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 03/13/2013) (Proposed 03/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 65 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S1976)
  • S.Amdt.53 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] (Submitted 03/13/2013) (Proposed 03/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 03/14/13 Amendment SA 53, under the order of 3/13/2013, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 36.
  • S.Amdt.33 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To strike certain authorities relating to the use for grants of funds of the Office of Economic Assistance of the Department of Defense.
    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 03/13/2013) (Proposed 03/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 03/13/13 Amendment SA 33 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.30 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To prohibit the use of funds to carry out the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 03/12/2013) (Proposed 03/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 20
    Latest Action: 03/13/13 Amendment SA 30 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 45 - 52. Record Vote Number: 34.
  • S.Amdt.29 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To prohibit the expenditure of Federal funds to enforce the Spill Prevention, Control, and Countermeasure rule of the Environmental Protection Agency against farmers.
    Sponsor: Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] (Submitted 03/12/2013) (Proposed 03/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 7
    Latest Action: 03/14/13 Amendment SA 29 as modified agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. (text as modified: CR S1837)
  • S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: In the nature of a substitute.
    Sponsor: Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] (Submitted 03/11/2013) (Proposed 03/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 26 as modified, as amended, agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 70 - 29. Record Vote Number: 42.