Refine your search

  • S.Amdt.93 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To transfer appropriations from the National Heritage Partnership Program to fund the resumption of public tours of the White House and visitor services and maintenance at national parks and monuments.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 03/14/2013) (Proposed 03/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 93, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 45 - 54. Record Vote Number: 40.
  • S.Amdt.115 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To increase by $25,000,000 the amount appropriated for Operation and Maintenance for the Department of Defense for programs, projects, and activities in the continental United States, and to provide an offset.
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 03/14/2013) (Proposed 03/14/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 115, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 40 - 59. Record Vote Number: 41. (text as modified: CR S1986)
  • S.Amdt.69 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To prohibit Urban Area Security Initiative grant recipients from funding projects that do not improve homeland security.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 03/13/2013) (Proposed 03/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 69, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 48 - 51. Record Vote Number: 39.
  • S.Amdt.66 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To temporarily freeze the hiring of nonessential Federal employees.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 03/13/2013) (Proposed 03/14/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 03/14/13 Amendment SA 66, under the order of 3/14/2013, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 45 - 54. Record Vote Number: 37. (consideration: CR S1829-1832; text: CR S1832)
  • S.Amdt.53 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] (Submitted 03/13/2013) (Proposed 03/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 03/14/13 Amendment SA 53, under the order of 3/13/2013, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 36.
  • S.Amdt.33 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To strike certain authorities relating to the use for grants of funds of the Office of Economic Assistance of the Department of Defense.
    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 03/13/2013) (Proposed 03/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 03/13/13 Amendment SA 33 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.30 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To prohibit the use of funds to carry out the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 03/12/2013) (Proposed 03/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 20
    Latest Action: 03/13/13 Amendment SA 30 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 45 - 52. Record Vote Number: 34.
  • S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: In the nature of a substitute.
    Sponsor: Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] (Submitted 03/11/2013) (Proposed 03/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 26 as modified, as amended, agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 70 - 29. Record Vote Number: 42.