Refine your search

  • S.Amdt.176 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To amend the title.
    Sponsor: Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] (Submitted 03/20/2013) (Proposed 03/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 03/21/13 Amendment SA 176 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  • S.Amdt.129 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To revise language regarding cluster munitions.
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 03/18/2013) (Proposed 03/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 129 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S1986)
  • S.Amdt.98 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] (Submitted 03/14/2013) (Proposed 03/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 98 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S1985)
  • S.Amdt.82 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: Relative to Agriculture Buildings and Facilities and Rental Payments, Food Safety and Inspection Service, and Domestic Food Programs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] (Submitted 03/13/2013) (Proposed 03/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 6
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 82 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.72 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To require the continuation of tuition assistance programs for members of the Armed Forces for the remainder of fiscal year 2013.
    Sponsor: Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] (Submitted 03/13/2013) (Proposed 03/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 23
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 72 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S1985)
  • S.Amdt.70 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To ensure that authorizing committees receive timely information from the Department of Homeland Security.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 03/13/2013) (Proposed 03/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 70 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S1976-1977)
  • S.Amdt.65 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To prohibit the use of funds to carry out the functions of the Political Science Program in the Division of Social and Economic Sciences of the Directorate for Social, Behavioral, and Economic Sciences of the National Science Foundation, except for research projects that the Director of the National Science Foundation certifies as promoting national security or the economic interests of the United States.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 03/13/2013) (Proposed 03/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 65 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S1976)
  • S.Amdt.33 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To strike certain authorities relating to the use for grants of funds of the Office of Economic Assistance of the Department of Defense.
    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 03/13/2013) (Proposed 03/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 03/13/13 Amendment SA 33 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.29 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To prohibit the expenditure of Federal funds to enforce the Spill Prevention, Control, and Countermeasure rule of the Environmental Protection Agency against farmers.
    Sponsor: Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] (Submitted 03/12/2013) (Proposed 03/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 7
    Latest Action: 03/14/13 Amendment SA 29 as modified agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. (text as modified: CR S1837)