Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 03/06/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/06/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/06/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/06/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/14/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/14/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/14/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/14/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/14/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/14/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/15/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/15/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/19/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/09/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 04/12/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/15/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/18/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 04/23/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/23/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/30/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/03/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/03/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/03/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/03/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/06/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/13/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/13/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/13/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 05/13/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/14/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/17/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/24/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/24/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/24/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 05/24/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/24/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 06/04/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/11/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/11/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/14/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/14/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/17/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/10/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/25/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 09/16/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 09/16/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/16/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/18/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 10/28/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 11/14/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 11/20/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/04/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 12/04/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/05/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 01/28/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/26/2014