Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/28/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 03/12/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/12/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/12/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/12/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/12/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/12/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 03/12/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/15/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/15/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/15/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/15/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 03/15/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/15/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/21/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/21/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/21/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/12/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/12/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/26/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 05/17/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/13/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/15/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/06/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/06/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/06/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/20/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/25/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 09/28/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 09/28/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 09/28/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 11/12/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 11/15/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 11/15/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 11/15/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 11/18/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/20/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 11/20/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 11/20/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/20/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 11/20/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 12/02/2013
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 12/02/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/02/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 12/02/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 12/02/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 12/02/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/02/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 12/02/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/02/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 12/10/2013