Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/05/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/05/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/05/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/05/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/05/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/06/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/06/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/06/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 03/06/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/06/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/06/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/12/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/12/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/12/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 03/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/12/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/13/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/19/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/19/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 05/08/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 05/08/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 05/21/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/12/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/16/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 07/25/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/17/2013