Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 02/27/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/27/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/14/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/14/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/10/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/10/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 04/23/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/26/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/26/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/09/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/09/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/06/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 08/02/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/11/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/11/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 10/04/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/04/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/23/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 11/14/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 12/12/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 12/12/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/12/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 12/12/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 01/08/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 01/08/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 01/08/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/08/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/08/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 01/08/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 01/08/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/08/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 01/08/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/08/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 01/08/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/08/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 01/10/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/10/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 01/10/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 01/29/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 01/29/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 01/29/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 01/29/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/29/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 02/11/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/06/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/06/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 03/06/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 03/06/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 03/06/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/06/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/06/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/13/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/13/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 03/13/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/26/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/26/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/08/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/08/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 04/08/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/08/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 04/08/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 04/10/2014