Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/05/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/07/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/14/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/15/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/18/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 03/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/18/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/07/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 06/03/2013