Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/05/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/05/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/11/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/18/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/21/2013