Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/11/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 03/19/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/11/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/12/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 04/16/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/06/2013