Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/25/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/22/2013