Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/07/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/07/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 03/25/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/16/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/13/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/30/2013