Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/12/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 03/15/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/18/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/20/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 05/08/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/06/2013