Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 03/05/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/07/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 03/11/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/25/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/15/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/06/2013