Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/07/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/11/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/15/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/15/2013