Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 03/14/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 03/25/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/16/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 04/23/2013