Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/05/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/05/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 03/11/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 03/25/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 05/08/2013