Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/26/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/18/2013