Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/25/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/11/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/24/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/06/2013