Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/04/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 03/05/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 03/05/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/05/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 03/07/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/07/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/07/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 03/11/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/12/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 03/13/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/13/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/13/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/14/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/14/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/19/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 03/19/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 03/20/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 03/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/25/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 03/25/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/25/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/09/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/12/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/12/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/15/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/15/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/23/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 04/26/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/06/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/06/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/22/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 07/24/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/30/2013