Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 02/27/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 03/05/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/05/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/05/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 03/05/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/05/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/05/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/05/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 03/05/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 03/05/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/05/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/12/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 03/12/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 03/20/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 03/20/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 03/20/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/20/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 03/20/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/20/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/20/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/20/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/20/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 03/21/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/21/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/09/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/09/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 04/17/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/17/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/17/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/17/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 04/26/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/08/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 05/08/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/08/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 05/08/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/08/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/08/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/08/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 05/08/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/14/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 05/14/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/16/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/21/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/21/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/04/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/04/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/04/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/11/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/11/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/11/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/11/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 06/11/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/14/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/20/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/20/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 06/20/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/20/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/20/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/20/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/20/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/25/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/25/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/25/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 06/25/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 06/25/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/08/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/08/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/08/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 07/08/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/08/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/08/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/08/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/08/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/08/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/08/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 07/11/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 07/11/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/18/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/18/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/18/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/18/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/30/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/30/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/01/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 08/01/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/01/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 10/08/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 10/16/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/16/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 10/30/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/25/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/28/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 04/01/2014