Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/05/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/10/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 04/16/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/30/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 08/02/2013