Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/27/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/27/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 02/27/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 02/27/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 02/27/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 03/04/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 03/04/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 03/04/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 03/04/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 03/04/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/04/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/04/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 03/05/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/05/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 03/05/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 03/05/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/05/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 03/05/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/05/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/05/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/05/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 03/05/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/05/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 03/06/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/06/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/06/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 03/06/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/06/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/06/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/06/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/12/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/12/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/12/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/12/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 03/12/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/12/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/12/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/12/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/12/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/12/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 03/13/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/13/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 03/13/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/13/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 03/13/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/13/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 03/14/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 03/14/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 03/14/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 03/15/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/15/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/15/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/15/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 03/15/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/15/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 03/18/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/18/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/18/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/18/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 03/18/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/18/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 03/18/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/18/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/18/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/19/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/19/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/25/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/25/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/25/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/25/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/25/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/25/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/25/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 03/25/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/25/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/25/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/25/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/09/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/09/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/18/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/08/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 06/25/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 09/09/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/12/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/24/2014