Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/06/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/06/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/06/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/06/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/06/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/06/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/06/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/06/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/21/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/21/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/12/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/12/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/12/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 04/12/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/25/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/25/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/25/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/09/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/22/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/22/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/09/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 07/11/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/30/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 09/30/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/02/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 10/09/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 10/30/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/30/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 10/30/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/13/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/13/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/28/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 01/28/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 01/28/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/29/2014
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/29/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 02/04/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/04/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 02/06/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/06/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 02/11/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 02/11/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/25/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 02/25/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/28/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/11/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/11/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 04/08/2014